Maths Trick Chapter 1

Lesson
These lessons are based on Vedic Maths” principles and other maths tricks. These principles are general in nature and can be applied in many ways and very very useful in commercial mathematics. I hope all of you like these lessons and make your calculation faster and save a lot of time in daily calculations and examinations or any entrance test like CAT /IIT /BANK PO /ENGINEERING ENTRANCE TEST/PMT /MCA ENTRANCE TEST/MBA ENTRANCE TEST etc
Method for multiplying numbers where the first figures are the same and the last figures add to1 0. 42 x 48 = Both numbers here start with 4 and the last figures (2 and 8) add up to 10. just multiply 4 by 5 (the next number up) to get 20 for the first part of the answer. And we multiply the last figures: 2 x 8 = 16 to get the last part of the answer Method for multiplying numbers where the first figures add up 10 and the last figures are same 44X64 Here first figures are 4 and 6 and there add up 10 and unit figures of both number are same Just multiplying the last figures 4×4=16 Put it at right-hand side Again multiplying the first figures and add common digit(4×6 )+4=24+4=28 put it at left-hand side Now we get required answer2816

Similarly, 36×76, 6X6 =36 right-hand side, (3×7)+6= 21+6=27 left-hand side Required answer is 2736 NOTE If multiplication of last figures is less than 10 add zero before unit digit Ex 81×21, 1×1=01,( 8×2)+1= 16+1=17 Required answer 1701 Method for multiplying numbers where the first number”s add up10 and the second number’s digits are same 46X55 Here the first number adds up is 10 and the second number “s digits are common i. e 5 Just multiplying last figures of both numbers 6×5 =30 put it at right-hand side Again multiplying first figures of both numbers and add common digit of the second number (4×5)+5 =20+5 =25 put it left-hand side
Lesson1 Multiplying numbers just over 100. 108 x 109 = 11772
The answer is in two parts: 117 and 72, 117 is just 108 + 9 (or 109 + 8), and 72 is just 8 x 9. Similarly 107 x 106 = 11342
HOW USEFUL IS THIS CALCULATION!
EXAMPLE 1 Compute the amount and the compound interest on Rs 10000. 00 on 2. years at4%per annum. Now 4×4=16 and 4+4=8 put 10 it becomes Rs 10816. 00 How simple! o calculation no extra time! Practice Test 1 Solve mentally these questions Note down your calculation time by watch (Suggested time 90 seconds) 22 X 28 35 X 35 48 X 42 73 X 33 12 X 92 48 X 28 28 X 22 37 X 88 91 X 66 118 X105 109 X108 112 X106 91 X 99 33 X 37 55X55 Now check your answer with the help of a calculator

Don't use plagiarized sources. Get Your Custom Essay on
Maths Trick Chapter 1
Just from \$13/Page
Pages (550 words)
Approximate price: -

Why Work with Us

Top Quality and Well-Researched Papers

We always make sure that writers follow all your instructions precisely. You can choose your academic level: high school, college/university or professional, and we will assign a writer who has a respective degree.

We have a team of professional writers with experience in academic and business writing. Many are native speakers and able to perform any task for which you need help.

Free Unlimited Revisions

If you think we missed something, send your order for a free revision. You have 10 days to submit the order for review after you have received the final document. You can do this yourself after logging into your personal account or by contacting our support.

Prompt Delivery and 100% Money-Back-Guarantee

All papers are always delivered on time. In case we need more time to master your paper, we may contact you regarding the deadline extension. In case you cannot provide us with more time, a 100% refund is guaranteed.

Original & Confidential

We use several writing tools checks to ensure that all documents you receive are free from plagiarism. Our editors carefully review all quotations in the text. We also promise maximum confidentiality in all of our services.

Our support agents are available 24 hours a day 7 days a week and committed to providing you with the best customer experience. Get in touch whenever you need any assistance.

Try it now!

Calculate the price of your order

Total price:
\$0.00

How it works?

Fill in the order form and provide all details of your assignment.

Proceed with the payment

Choose the payment system that suits you most.

Our Services

No need to work on your paper at night. Sleep tight, we will cover your back. We offer all kinds of writing services.

Essay Writing Service

No matter what kind of academic paper you need and how urgent you need it, you are welcome to choose your academic level and the type of your paper at an affordable price. We take care of all your paper needs and give a 24/7 customer care support system.